DC B23-0145 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it regulates the practice of tele-psychology and the face to face practice of psychology across state boundaries. Among other things, It provides legal recognition to psychologists properly licensed out of state. It also requires all compact states share licensee information with compact states and create a coordinated database on participating compact psychologists. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District of Columbia Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01CouncilAct A23-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00016
2020-12-23CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-12-22CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0538
2020-12-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020
2020-12-01CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-11-30CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-11-10CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-11-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0145
2020-10-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-10-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0145
2019-12-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0145 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-02-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback