DC B23-0109 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Law L23-0005, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5543, Expires on Nov 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Law L23-0005, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5543, Expires on Nov 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bryant Street Tax Increment Financing Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Bryant Street Tax Increment Financing Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Council - Final Reading cc (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Council | Law L23-0005, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5543, Expires on Nov 29, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | Council | Act A23-0020 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2696 |
2019-03-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-03-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-02-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0020 |
2019-02-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 7, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0109 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |