DC B22-0904 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0583
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0583
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill increases the Renewable Portfolio Standard to 100% by 2032, establishes a solar energy standard post 2032, and establishes standards electricity suppliers must meet regarding purchasing a percentage of their energy from long-term purchase agreements with renewable generators. It removes restrictions on energy efficiency measures. It expands the uses of the Sustainable Energy Trust Fund and also establishes an energy performance standard program for buildings at the Department of Energy and Environment. Among other things, it authorizes the Mayor to commit the District to participation in regional programs with the purpose of limiting greenhouse gas emissions and requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue regulations tying the vehicle excise tax to fuel efficiency.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Cleanenergy Dc Omnibus Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - Amendments #1 and #2 (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie and Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - Amendments #1 and #2 (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0583 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0583 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie and Cheh) |
2018-11-27 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-27 | Council | Amendments #1 and #2 (McDuffie) |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0904 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0904 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0904 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2018-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |