DC B22-0663 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill approves amendments to the Framework Element in the Comprehensive Plan Framework Amendment Act of 2018. The 2006 Comprehensive Plan is the District's 20-year blueprint for laying the framework for the growth and development of the District. It recommends a review and amendment approximately every 5 years.
Title
Comprehensive Plan Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0663 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0663 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39567/B22-0663-Introduction.pdf |