DC B22-0400 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes a court to issue a temporary civil protection order, prohibiting someone from having in his or her custody or control any firearms or ammunition until the court-scheduled hearing for an ex parte civil protection order. The court must find a reasonable belief to find that the subject of the petition poses an immediate and present danger of causing personal injury to self or others. It also establishes an extreme risk civil protection order for a year when a court finds by a preponderance of evidence that the subject of the petition poses a significant threat of harm to self or others.
Title
Extreme Risk Civil Protection Order Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0400 Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0400 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38582/B22-0400-Introduction.pdf |