DC B21-0334 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0158 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0158 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-158 reforms the District's procurement processes. Among other structural and procedural reforms, it establishes the Office of the Ombudsman for Contracting and Procurement; makes changes to the Council's review of contracts; sets guidelines for privatization contracts; and provides for enhanced transparency in the District's contracting and procurement practices.
Title
Procurement Integrity, Transparency, And Accountability Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-21 | Council | Law Number L21-0158 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-26 | Council | Act A21-0486 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10752 |
2016-08-24 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0486 |
2016-08-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 22, 2016 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-07-12 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2016-07-12 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-06-28 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-06-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0334 |
2015-11-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0334 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |