CT SR00015 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Dr. Manisha Juthani Of Southport To Be Reappointed Commissioner Of Public Health.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Dr. Manisha Juthani Of Southport To Be Reappointed Commissioner Of Public Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 23 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 25 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |