CT SR00014 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Andrew N. Mais Of Wilton To Be Reappointed Insurance Commissioner.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Andrew N. Mais Of Wilton To Be Reappointed Insurance Commissioner.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 28 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 24 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/26 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |