CT SR00007 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Police Union (np-1 Bargaining Unit).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut And The Connecticut State Police Union (np-1 Bargaining Unit).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 11 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-01-19 | Senate | File Number 1 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 11 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 01/24/23 5:00 PM |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/18 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2022-12-30 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |