CT SJ00037 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable James W. Abrams Of Meriden To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable James W. Abrams Of Meriden To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 177 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Unfavorable) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Unfavorable) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 637 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 516 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 05/16 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |