CT SJ00007 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Granting The Claims Commissioner An Extension Of Time To Dispose Of Certain Claims Against The State Pursuant To Chapter 53 Of The General Statutes.
Title
Resolution Granting The Claims Commissioner An Extension Of Time To Dispose Of Certain Claims Against The State Pursuant To Chapter 53 Of The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | File Number 436 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 272 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |