CT SB01115 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group that shall study the state's civil laws and prepare recommendations on proposed changes to such laws.
Title
An Act Concerning Amendments To The Trust Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 AS AMENDED (Y: 81 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | House | Public Act 19-23 |
2019-05-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10226 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | File Number 767 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 370 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |