CT SB01089 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the general statutes concerning the provision of mental health services.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | File Number 862 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-15 | Senate | File Number 662 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 381 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |