CT SB01063 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the use of certain microbials for the control of grubs, expand the current prohibition on the application of lawn care pesticides at schools to include grades nine through twelve, prohibit the application of lawn care pesticides on athletic fields and municipal greens and re-establish the Pesticide Advisory Council.
Title
An Act Concerning The Application Of Pesticides On Municipal Playgrounds And Authorizing The Use Of Certain Microbials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Environment |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | File Number 765 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-08 | Senate | File Number 559 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 316 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |