CT SB01057 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To change the minimum staffing levels at nursing home facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Minimum Staffing Levels In Nursing Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 522 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 308 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |