CT SB01054 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the parents of a child who was a homicide victim to request that the autopsy report not be publicly disclosed.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disclosure Of Autopsy Reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Michael McLachlan [R] | Rep. Steven Mikutel [D] |
Sen. Leonard Suzio [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-31 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-31 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-26 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-03 | File Number 727 | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 444 | |
2011-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |