CT SB01032 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to conduct a study concerning various revisions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions And Additions To The Statutes Relating To Education And Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 385 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Public Act 21-199 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 596 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9976 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | File Number 405 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 242 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |