CT SB01019 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To streamline various programs of the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, including the Noise Program and the Streamline Channel Program.
Title
An Act Concerning Administrative Streamlining At The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 556 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 282 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 282 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 13-205 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6838 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | File Number 878 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 589 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 6838 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6684 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6672 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-11 | Senate | File Number 444 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |