CT SB01009 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Creating The Office Of Governmental Accountability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 436 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 275 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |