CT SB01007 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow children who are in the custody of the Department of Children and Families, or are the subject of a petition for adoption, to have an input into their permanency outcomes.
Title
An Act Concerning Permanency Placements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Children |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | File Number 140 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 134 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |