CT SB00978 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - File Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - File Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To incentivize rehabilitation among incarcerated individuals and provide a second chance for those who were convicted and sentenced before twenty-five years of age.
Title
An Act Concerning Parole Opportunities For Individuals Serving Lengthy Sentences For Crimes Committed Before The Individual Turned Twenty-one Years Of Age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | File Number 611 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 353 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |