CT SB00978 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide additional funding to residential care homes to retain staff and cover property costs.
Title
An Act Concerning Residential Care Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |