CT SB00978 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - House Calendar Number 685
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - House Calendar Number 685
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To change the threshold for requiring contracts be awarded to the lowest responsible and qualified bidder from five hundred thousand dollars to two million dollars, to require subcontractors to be prequalified at the time of bid submittal and to change the threshold for separate specifications for classes of work from twenty-five thousand dollars to one hundred thousand dollars.
Title
An Act Concerning Subcontractor Prequalification And Classification Thresholds And Increasing The Threshold For Requiring Competitive Bidding Of Public Works Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 534 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 685 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7878 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | File Number 608 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 442 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |