CT SB00965 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide additional funding to municipalities for the removal of dead or hazardous trees in public areas and along town roads.
Title
An Act Providing Funding For The Removal Of Hazardous Or Dead Trees By Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 345 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | House | Public Act 23-190 |
2023-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-31 | Senate | House Calendar Number 615 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-30 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6886 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | File Number 145 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 110 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |