CT SB00959 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine early-stage business to include businesses that have been in operation for up to seven years and to exclude businesses that have begun phase II clinical trials.
Title
An Act Concerning Penalties For The Filing Of Paper Documents With The Department Of Revenue Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-04-07 | Senate | File Number 493 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 287 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |