CT SB00956 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide medical assistance to certain individuals regardless of immigration status.
Title
An Act Providing Medical Assistance To Certain Individuals Regardless Of Immigration Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 516 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 306 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |