CT SB00954 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require institutions of higher education to report accidental deaths that occur on campus.
Title
An Act Requiring The Reporting Of Accidents That Resulted In Serious Physical Injuries Or Death At Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 362 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-184 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 438 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7643 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 191 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 153 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |