CT SB00953 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Labor Peace.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 265 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 208 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |