CT SB00952 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) create solar energy storage goals, (2) increase the virtual net metering cap, (3) permit ownership of solar power generation facilities by electric distribution companies, and (4) direct the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection and the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to investigate solar energy development programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Energy Storage.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Sen. Will Haskell [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 21-53 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 534 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7906 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 291 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 182 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |