CT SB00944 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Establishing A Full-day Kindergarten Requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |