CT SB00935 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that any student whose parent or legal guardian has been called to duty for, is on leave from, or has immediately returned from deployment to a combat zone or combat supporting post shall be granted at least ten days of excused absences to visit with his or her parent or legal guardian, and to ensure that such student does not fall behind other students by requiring that he or she complete assignments missed during the period of excused absence prior to returning to school.
Title
An Act Concerning Excused Absences From School For Children Of Service Members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |