CT SB00934 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require payments from the State Fire Administrator to volunteer fire companies that respond to calls on the property of state parks or state forests.
Title
An Act Requiring Payments To Volunteer Fire Companies That Respond To Calls In State Parks And State Forests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |