CT SB00927 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement that all armed services members must serve in a "combat zone" to be considered "new employees" under the Standardized Training and Employment program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of New Employee In The Unemployed Armed Forces Member Subsidized Training And Employment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 221 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Public Act 13-63 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 383 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5880 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | File Number 68 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 127 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |