CT SB00925 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 527
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 527
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an advanced operator's retraining program.
Title
An Act Concerning An Advanced Operator's Retraining Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 527 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 270 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |