CT SB00917 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To redefine "privatization contract" and "state contracting agency", modify the quorum requirement of the State Contracting Standards Board, impose additional requirements on proposed privatization contracts and require the Auditors of Public Accounts to issue compliance reports regarding staffing levels of the State Contracting Standards Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Contracting Standards Board And Requirements For Privatization Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 138 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 89 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |