CT SB00915 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide relief to Medicaid applicants who are unable to immediately liquidate assets to remain within eligibility guidelines.
Title
An Act Concerning The Treatment Of Assets In Medicaid Eligibility Determinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |