CT SB00908 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit any individual who has been denied employment or discharged on the basis of a prior criminal charge or conviction that has been erased to bring a civil action against the offending employer.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Criminal Conviction Information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | File Number 248 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 208 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |