CT SB00907 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent an employer or employer's insurer from discontinuing, reducing or denying the employee's course of treatment under the Workers' Compensation Act unless the employer provides notice and an opinion from another physician or surgeon that such treatment is not reasonable or necessary.
Title
An Act Concerning Additional Requirements For An Employer's Notice To Dispute Certain Care Deemed Reasonable For An Employee Under The Workers' Compensation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5560 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5560 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | File Number 313 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 236 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |