CT SB00900 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the Uniform Partition of Heirs' Property Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Adoption Of The Uniform Partition Of Heirs' Property Act And Estates Given In Fee Tail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 335 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-234 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 593 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7450 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | File Number 736 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 427 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |