CT SB00887 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the Care 4 Kids subsidy program to extend the eligibility to recipients of program benefits who take unpaid leave from their employment due to the birth or impending birth of a child provided certain criteria are met.
Title
An Act Concerning The Care 4 Kids Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 200 (Y: 118 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 194 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 194 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-50 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-16 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 490 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-03-18 | Senate | File Number 56 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 105 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |