CT SB00887 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Calendar Number 575
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Calendar Number 575
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage to a named insured or a household member of the named insured for damages arising from being struck as a pedestrian during the theft of an insured vehicle.
Title
An Act Concerning Uninsured Motorist Coverage For Bodily Injury To A Named Insured Or Relative During The Theft Of A Motor Vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 310 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Calendar Number 575 | |
2011-06-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-31 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5524 | |
2011-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-04 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2011-04-18 | File Number 562 | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 349 | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-30 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-14 | Public Hearing 03/18 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |