CT SB00866 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the annual report submitted by the board of directors of the Connecticut Port Authority to include a summary of the authority's activities and recommendations for legislation to promote the authority's purpose.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Port Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 450 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 283 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |