CT SB00864 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of the effectiveness of (1) requiring state Medicaid to pay the cost of institution-sponsored health insurance premiums and provide supplemental coverage to medically indigent students enrolled in a constituent unit, or (2) prohibiting a student from opting out of institution-sponsored health insurance for purposes of qualifying for state Medicaid benefits.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of The Use Of Medicaid To Cover The Cost Of Health Insurance For College Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Special Act 15-5 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 510 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5985 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | File Number 20 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 75 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |