CT SB00856 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require acute care hospitals to make interpreter services available.
Title
An Act Concerning Language Interpreters In Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 125 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 114 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 114 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Public Act 15-34 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House Passed |
2015-04-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 482 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | File Number 94 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 125 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |