CT SB00838 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) eliminate cost-sharing for certain mammograms and breast ultrasounds, and (2) require health insurance coverage for (A) a baseline mammogram for any woman who is thirty years of age or older, (B) an annual mammogram for any woman who receives a recommendation from such woman's treating physician and (i) is thirty years of age or older, (ii) has a family history or prior personal history of breast cancer, or (iii) has a prior personal history of breast disease diagnosed through biopsy as benign, and (C) comprehensive breast ultrasound screening for any woman who receives a recommendation from such woman's treating physician and (i) is thirty years of age or older, (ii) has a family history or prior personal history of breast cancer, or (iii) has a prior personal history of breast disease diagnosed through biopsy as benign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Vision Plans, Optometrists And Ophthalmologists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 286 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26HousePublic Act 19-201
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10705
2019-05-31SenateHouse Calendar Number 686
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-29SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-29SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-15SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 449
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 212
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback