CT SB00836 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit municipal or special taxing district pension systems from diminishing or eliminating certain retiree's rights and benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning Permanent Partial Disability Benefits And Pension Offsets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | File Number 39 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 62 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/09 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |