CT SB00807 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Revisions To The Public Health Statutes, Dental Assistants And Dental Therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 296 AS AMENDED (Y: 106 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 116 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7997 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 117 PASS AS AMENDED BY A (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 116 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7997 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 117 PASS AS AMENDED BY A (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Public Act 19-56 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 565 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7997 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | File Number 57 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 52 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |