CT SB00807 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) increase license fees charged to, the minimum net worth of and security maintained by preferred provider networks, and (2) make minor technical changes to certain insurance-related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Transportation Network Companies And Taxicabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 387 SENATE AMD A (Y: 137 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 388 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8986 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 388 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8986 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Public Act 17-203 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8986 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | File Number 244 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 148 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |