CT SB00800 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to allow emergency medical services personnel to provide community-based health care services.
Title
An Act Concerning A Pilot Program Allowing Emergency Medical Services Personnel To Provide Community-based Health Care Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | Senate | File Number 637 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 365 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |