CT SB00714 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Merged Into SB00527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Merged Into SB00527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding to complete the restoration of America's oldest commercial vessel and last remaining whaling ship.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Mystic Seaport Museum In New London.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Merged Into SB00527 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00714&which_year=2013 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2013/TOB/S/2013SB-00714-R00-SB.htm |